This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/19/2019 at 08:05:13 (UTC).

REHAB & THERAPY WELLNESS OF SOUTH FLORIDA, LLC VS WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 REHAB THERAPY WELLNESS OF SOUTH FLORIDA, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REHAB & THERAPY WELLNESS OF SOUTH FLORIDA, LLC

Assignor

OLIVER, MONICA

Defendant

WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brown, Felicia B

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

03/11/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/11/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion for Attorneys Fees

02/12/2019 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Notice of Interrogatory

02/07/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/07/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/07/2019 - Request for Admissions

Email Notice:

02/07/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice:

02/07/2019 - Notice:

Demand for Jury Trial

02/04/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Pre Trial Summons

01/18/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

01/14/2019 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: REHAB & THERAPY WELLNESS OF SOUTH FLORIDA LLC; WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2380062AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$330.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/17/2019 REGISTER#:238CASHIER:ANDELLW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3550025AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:BROWN, FELICIA B PO BOX 558427 MIAMI FL 33255-8427 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less