This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/06/2020 at 04:53:51 (UTC).

REDONDO GUERRA, PAULA Y VS BAQUERO, DANNY

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 REDONDO GUERRA, PAULA Y filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BAQUERO, DANNY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Redondo Guerra, Paula Y

Respondent

Baquero, Danny

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

12/19/2019 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: CHC Courtroom 22-C 175 N.W. 1st Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31748:2738; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: DATED FOR12/19/19@9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Baquero Danny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgment of Status Quo Temp Domestic Relations Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement of Receipt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Waiver; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Baquero Danny

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement of Receipt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgment of Status Quo Temp Domestic Relations Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2630030AMT PAID:$459.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3340-SHERIFF - DADE1$40.00$40.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Courthouse Center; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Issued for Sheriff Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.