This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/07/2020 at 07:41:03 (UTC).

REDLAND 272, LLC VS J.G.T. TRANSPORTATION, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 REDLAND 272, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against J G T TRANSPORTATION, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REDLAND 272, LLC

Defendant

J.G.T. TRANSPORTATION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fodiman, Todd A

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

03/17/2020 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/20/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(A) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/19/2020 - (A) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

02/14/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: J.G.T. TRANSPORTATION INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520105AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:FODIMAN, TODD A 3525 AVIATION AVENUE SUITE 301 MIAMI FL 33131-3139 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: J.G.T. TRANSPORTATION INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (A) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480094AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:FODIMAN, TODD A 3525 AVIATION AVENUE SUITE 301 MIAMI FL 33131-3139 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.