This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/30/2019 at 14:07:19 (UTC).

RED DIAMOND MEDICAL GROUP, INC VS WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 RED DIAMOND MEDICAL GROUP, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RED DIAMOND MEDICAL GROUP, INC

Assignor

PEREZ, YENDRI

Defendant

WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brown, Felicia B

 

Court Documents

Notice of Interrogatory

03/18/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice:

03/18/2019 - Notice:

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/04/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service of Process

03/04/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Request for Production

02/07/2019 - Request for Production

Email Notice:

02/07/2019 - Email Notice:

Demand for Jury Trial

01/22/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Pre Trial Summons

01/10/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

01/09/2019 - Statement of Claim

Motion for Attorneys Fees

03/21/2019 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Request for Admissions

03/18/2019 - Request for Admissions

Motion for Summary Judgment

03/06/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Memorandum of Disposition

03/04/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Filing:

02/13/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Request for Admissions

02/07/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

02/07/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLEASE DISREGARD: PLEADING FILED MISSING CASE NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLEASE DISREGARD; PLEADING FILED WITH INCORRECT CASE NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990039AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$290.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/10/2019 REGISTER#:299CASHIER:ANDELLW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490075AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:BROWN, FELICIA B PO BOX 558427 MIAMI FL 33255-8427 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less