Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/09/2021 at 15:06:51 (UTC).

REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC VS MARIE SUZE ST FLEUR ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARIE SUZE ST FLEUR. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC

Defendants

LAFORTUNE (Personal Rep), NERE G

ST FLEUR, MARIA

ST FLEUR, MARIE SUZE

STATE OF FLORIDA

OBEI, MARIA S

CITY OF NORTH MIAMI

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORA

BOYER, VERGENA EMMANUEL

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

DESSOURCES, CARLINE

ESTATE OF VALCY OBEI (DECEASED)

HARVEY RUVIN CLERK OF THE COURTS MIAMI DADE COUNT

LAFORTUNE, NERE G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'keeffe, Loretta Comiskey

 

Court Documents

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/05/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/05/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/05/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/05/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/05/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/05/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/05/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/05/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/05/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/05/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Filing:

02/05/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Lis Pendens

02/05/2021 - Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

01/26/2021 - Lis Pendens

Certificate of Possession of Note

01/25/2021 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Complaint

01/25/2021 - Complaint

Lis Pendens

01/26/2021 - Lis Pendens

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

01/25/2021 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Email Notice:

01/25/2021 - Email Notice:

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570285AMT PAID:$139.00 NAME:O'KEEFFE, LORETTA COMISKEY 3321 HENDERSON BLVD TAMPA FL 33609-2921 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 3139-SUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32338:3090; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580040AMT PAID:$442.50 NAME:O'KEEFFE, LORETTA COMISKEY 3321 HENDERSON BLVD TAMPA FL 33609-2921 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$32.50$32.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32316:3835; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRIMARY EMAIL: LOKEEFFE@GIBBLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Real Time Resolutions, Inc. is a litigant