Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/01/2021 at 00:10:31 (UTC).

REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC VS GILBERTO VALDERRAMA ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GILBERTO VALDERRAMA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC

Defendants

VALDERRAMA, ERICK

VALDERRAMA, ROBIN

HERNANDEZ, TERESA

DE JESUS HERNANDEZ, TERESA

VALDERRAMA, GILBERTO

CITY OF HIALEAH DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND SEWERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'keeffe, Loretta Comiskey

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/28/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/28/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/28/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/28/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/28/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/28/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/28/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Lis Pendens

01/25/2021 - Lis Pendens

Certificate of Possession of Note

01/22/2021 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Complaint

01/22/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/26/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/26/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/26/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/26/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/26/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/26/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/26/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/26/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CITY OF HIALEAH DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND SEWERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VALDERRAMA ERICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VALDERRAMA ROBIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580055AMT PAID:$930.00 NAME:O'KEEFFE, LORETTA COMISKEY 3321 HENDERSON BLVD TAMPA FL 33609-2921 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$15.00$15.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32314:4563; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: LOKEEFFE@GIBBLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Real Time Resolutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'keeffe, Loretta Comiskey