This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/21/2021 at 03:16:39 (UTC).

RAYMONDE LOUIME ET AL VS PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 RAYMONDE LOUIME filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Louime, Raymonde

Louime, Daniel

Defendants

Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County

Department of Off-Street Parking of Ciy of Miami

Miami Parking Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marc Alan Kaufman

Defendant Attorneys

Frastai, Daniel

Cohen, Nykeah L

Button, Melissa Lynne

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance

08/13/2021 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/14/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/14/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

06/25/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/25/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Request for Admissions

09/17/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

09/17/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Order of Dismissal

09/13/2021 - Order of Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

09/09/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Appearance

09/09/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

09/07/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Production

09/03/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

09/03/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Service Returned

08/31/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/26/2021 - Service Returned

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/26/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 32731:1838; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32727:4928; Event Type: Event; Comments: AS TO DEFENDANT, PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI DADE COUNTY, ONLY. Parties: Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cohen Nykeah L; Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Frastai Daniel; Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Department of Off-Street Parking of Ciy of Miami

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070216AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:MARC ALAN KAUFMAN 350 E LAS OLAS BLVD STE 970 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301-4211 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/09/2021 REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580326AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:MARC ALAN KAUFMAN 350 E LAS OLAS BLVD STE 970 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301-4211 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/26/2021 REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miami Parking Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County The is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cohen, Nykeah L