This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/10/2020 at 01:31:39 (UTC).

R A R 2-20080 W DIXIE HIGHWAY (LLC) VS ANTHONY ADAMS

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 R A R 2-20080 W DIXIE HIGHWAY LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ANTHONY ADAMS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Midtown Aventura

RAR2-20080 West Dixie Highway (LLC)

R A R 2-20080 W Dixie Highway (LLC)

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

Adams, Anthony

RAR2-20080 West Dixie Highway LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth J Lowenhaupt

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

02/29/2020 - Service Returned

Voluntary Dismissal

02/20/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

02/20/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Complaint

02/14/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2240016AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/05/2020 REGISTER#:224CASHIER:MATTIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31833:886; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Adams Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Adams Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3460038AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT 7765 SW 87TH AVE STE 201 MIAMI FL 33173-2586 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.