Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 03/05/2021 at 20:43:51 (UTC).

RAQUEL BELTRAN VS HILLSTONE RESTAURANT GROUP, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 RAQUEL BELTRAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HILLSTONE RESTAURANT GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELTRAN, RAQUEL

Defendants

HOUSTON'S

ORLANDO MARRIOT LAKE MARY

HEATHROW HOTEL OWNERS, LLC.

PINNACLE HOTEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC

HILLSTONE RESTAURANT GROUP, INC.

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Perkins, David Lloyd

Defendant Attorneys

Robert M Pickett

Robert Alan Ader

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

03/01/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

03/01/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Request for Production

02/24/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/24/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

02/24/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/24/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion for Extension of Time

02/23/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

02/23/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

02/13/2021 - Service Returned

Request for Admissions

01/15/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

01/15/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

01/15/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

01/15/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Interrogatory

01/15/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

01/15/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

01/15/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

01/15/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/15/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Robert M Pickett; PINNACLE HOTEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Robert Alan Ader; HILLSTONE RESTAURANT GROUP INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Robert Alan Ader; HILLSTONE RESTAURANT GROUP INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINNACLE HOTEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSTON'S is a litigant

Latest cases where BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HILLSTONE RESTARAUNT GROUP INC is a litigant