This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/02/2021 at 01:00:21 (UTC).

RAMON MONTESINO VS ACAR LEASING LTD INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 RAMON MONTESINO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ACAR LEASING LTD INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTESINO, RAMON

Defendants

ACAR LEASING LTD INC

LAZARO GOMEZ HURTADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Perez, Juan J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/13/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

05/13/2021 - Complaint

Amended Complaint

05/18/2021 - Amended Complaint

Notice:

05/18/2021 - Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/18/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/18/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/21/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/21/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Voluntary Dismissal

06/04/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32550:967; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ACAR LEASING LTD INC; LAZARO GOMEZ HURTADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: LAZARO GOMEZ HURTADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ACAR LEASING LTD INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2630267AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:PEREZ, JUAN J. 1414 NW 107TH AVE STE 302 DORAL FL 33172 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/19/2021 REGISTER#:263CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570058AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:PEREZ, JUAN J. 1414 NW 107TH AVE STE 302 DORAL FL 33172 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/15/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACAR LEASING LTD. AKA GM FINANCIAL LEASING LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Perez, Juan J.