This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/30/2022 at 23:09:17 (UTC).

RAMBLAS AT VIA VENTURA NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOC INC VS DUPONT, TYWANDA

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 RAMBLAS AT VIA VENTURA NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOC INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DUPONT, TYWANDA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMBLAS AT VIA VENTURA NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOC INC

Defendants

DUPONT, TYWANDA

DUPONT ADAMS, ANNIE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wasserstein, Daniel

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/09/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

05/09/2022 - Complaint

Email Notice:

05/09/2022 - Email Notice:

Lis Pendens

05/09/2022 - Lis Pendens

Notice of Hearing-

08/18/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Filing:

08/09/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Summary Judgment

08/09/2022 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Order of Default

07/06/2022 - Order of Default

Motion for Default

07/05/2022 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

06/29/2022 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Non-Military Affidavit

06/28/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default

06/28/2022 - Motion for Default

Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

06/28/2022 - Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

Service Returned

06/28/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/28/2022 - Service Returned

Summons Returned - No Service

06/28/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

06/28/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

06/28/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: SEPTEMBER 28, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: VARIOUS AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTED. Parties: DUPONT TYWANDA; DUPONT ADAMS ANNIE M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DUPONT TYWANDA; DUPONT ADAMS ANNIE M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160110AMT PAID:$408.50NAME:WASSERSTEIN, DANIEL301 NE 51ST ST STE 2199BOCA RATON FL 33431-4901COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$2.50$2.503142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$408.50RECEIPT DATE:05/10/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33178:1211; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DANW@WASSERSTEINPA.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less