This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 10:13:40 (UTC).

RADIOLOGY REGIONAL CENTER (PA) VS LIBERTY MUTUAL INS CO

Case Summary

On 06/11/2022 RADIOLOGY REGIONAL CENTER PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Radiology Regional Center (PA)

Assignor

Robinson, Willie Mae

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Prince, Michael Ryan

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/11/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

06/11/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/17/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3200023AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PRINCE, MICHAEL RYAN7171 N. FEDERAL HIGHWAYBOCA RATON FL 33487COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/22/2022REGISTER#:320CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Liberty Mutual Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060354AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:PRINCE, MICHAEL RYAN7171 N. FEDERAL HIGHWAYBOCA RATON FL 33487COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:06/14/2022REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Radiology Regional Center (PA) is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE , MICHAEL RYAN