This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/19/2022 at 18:57:05 (UTC).

R X IMAGING OF SWFL (LLC) VS SAFECO INS CO OF ILLINOIS

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 R X IMAGING OF SWFL LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAFECO INS CO OF ILLINOIS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R X Imaging Of Swfl (LLC)

Assignor

Tannenbaum, Alan

Defendant

Safeco Ins Co Of Illinois

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chad L Christensen

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/10/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

06/10/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/17/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

06/24/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Voluntary Dismissal

07/05/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33281:2489; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Safeco Ins Co Of Illinois

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Safeco Ins Co Of Illinois

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3200034AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CHAD L CHRISTENSEN7171 N FEDERAL HWYBOCA RATON FL 33487-1612COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/22/2022REGISTER#:320CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Safeco Ins Co Of Illinois

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060055AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:CHAD L CHRISTENSEN7171 N FEDERAL HWYBOCA RATON FL 33487-1612COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:06/11/2022REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTENSEN , CHAD