This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/17/2020 at 06:41:02 (UTC).

R N M INVESTMENT GROUP INC VS. BORN AGAIN IN CHRIST ORRATTACHEURS A CHRIST

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 R N M INVESTMENT GROUP INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BORN AGAIN IN CHRIST ORRATTACHEURS A CHRIST. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

R N M

R N M Investment Group Inc

Defendant

Born Again In Christ Orrattacheurs A Christ

Not Classified By Court

Eviction Property Address

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Issued

08/19/2020 - Writ of Possession Issued

Default Final Judgment

08/18/2020 - Default Final Judgment

Default

08/06/2020 - Default

Service Returned

03/17/2020 - Service Returned

Notice of Default Not Entered

03/13/2020 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Motion for Default

03/11/2020 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

03/11/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit of Non-Payment

03/11/2020 - Affidavit of Non-Payment

Affidavit as to Costs

03/11/2020 - Affidavit as to Costs

Notice of Default Not Entered

03/03/2020 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Service Returned

02/15/2020 - Service Returned

Complaint

02/14/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Born Again In Christ Orrattacheurs A Christ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 32062:3535; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Born Again In Christ Orrattacheurs A Christ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Born Again In Christ Orrattacheurs A Christ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2ND PLEASE DISREGUARD ERROR Parties: Born Again In Christ Orrattacheurs A Christ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Non-Payment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Born Again In Christ Orrattacheurs A Christ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Born Again In Christ Orrattacheurs A Christ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Born Again In Christ Orrattacheurs A Christ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: MISSING DEF NAME IN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at North Dade; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2130021AMT PAID:$195.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:MASTER CARDTENDER AMT:$585.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/14/202

    Read MoreRead Less