This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/07/2020 at 01:55:49 (UTC).

QUALITY MOLD TESTING, INC. VS FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 QUALITY MOLD TESTING, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUALITY MOLD TESTING, INC.

Assignor

ABREU, EMILIO

Defendant

FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lavigne, Donald S

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/26/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/24/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

02/14/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3650121AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:LAVIGNE, DONALD S 1111 BRICKELL AVE STE 1900 MIAMI FL 33131 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480093AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:LAVIGNE, DONALD S 1111 BRICKELL AVE STE 1900 MIAMI FL 33131 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.