This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/03/2019 at 15:39:40 (UTC).

QUALITY MEDICAL GROUP, INC. VS INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 QUALITY MEDICAL GROUP, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUALITY MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

Assignor

MOLL, ASSAD

Defendant

INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wajih A Shirazi (esq)

Defendant Attorney

Fundora, Gabriel O

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

03/01/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Memorandum of Disposition

02/25/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice:

02/22/2019 - Notice:

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

02/21/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/21/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

02/21/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Notice of Appearance

02/21/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

02/14/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice:

02/04/2019 - Notice:

SP Pretrial Date

01/22/2019 - SP Pretrial Date

Statement of Claim

01/14/2019 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31351:2362; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: SETTLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2140004AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$50.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/22/2019 REGISTER#:214CASHIER:MARGABR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3610030AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:WAJIH A SHIRAZI (ESQ) DOS SANTOS & SHIRAZI, LLC 10700 CARIBBEAN BLVD. PE CUTLER BAY FL 33189 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less