This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/25/2020 at 17:46:42 (UTC).

QUALITY DIAGNOSTICS & REHABILITATION, INC. VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 QUALITY DIAGNOSTICS REHABILITATION, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quality Diagnostics & Rehabilitation, Inc.

Assignor

Urra, Dayron

Defendant

United Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lewis J Mertz

Defendant Attorneys

Harris, Andrea L

White, Camille A.

 

Court Documents

Order:

05/07/2020 - Order:

Notice of Interrogatory

04/27/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/27/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

04/27/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

04/27/2020 - Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

04/27/2020 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

04/07/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

04/07/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Filing:

04/02/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Extension of Time

04/01/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Interrogatory

02/20/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

02/20/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

02/20/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Compliance

02/20/2020 - Notice of Compliance

Complaint

02/13/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTED DFNTS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Trial (case at Issue); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2740035AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/02/2020 REGISTER#:274CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580258AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:LEWIS J MERTZ MERTZ LAW GROUP 4970 SW 72ND AVENUE SUITE 109 MIAMI FL 33155 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: 15,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.