This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/27/2020 at 03:58:54 (UTC).

QUALITY DIAGNOSTICS & REHABILITATION CENTER, INC. VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 QUALITY DIAGNOSTICS REHABILITATION CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quality Diagnostics & Rehabilitation Center, Inc.

Assignor

Barrios, Yutsimi

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lewis J Mertz

Defendant Attorney

Brooks, Jonathan S

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Production

04/27/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Filing:

04/11/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Extension of Time

04/07/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Filing:

04/06/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Response to Request for Admissions

04/06/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Request:

04/06/2020 - Request:

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/30/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion:

03/25/2020 - Motion:

Motion to Dismiss

03/25/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Appearance

03/23/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Demand for Jury Trial

03/23/2020 - Demand for Jury Trial

Pre Trial Summons

03/02/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Interrogatory

02/19/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

02/19/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

02/19/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Compliance

02/19/2020 - Notice of Compliance

Statement of Claim

02/13/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2740029AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/02/2020 REGISTER#:274CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440047AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:LEWIS J MERTZ MERTZ LAW GROUP 4970 SW 72ND AVENUE SUITE 109 MIAMI FL 33155 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 8,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.