This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/11/2020 at 03:32:23 (UTC).

PROMEDICAL CENTER HIALEAH CORP VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 PROMEDICAL CENTER HIALEAH CORP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROMEDICAL CENTER HIALEAH CORP

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Acosta, Franco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Neil M

Defendant Attorney

Daniel E Faltas, Esq

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition

03/05/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Response to Request for Production

01/14/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

01/14/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Answer and Affirmative Defense

12/26/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

12/20/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

11/05/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Complaint

10/15/2019 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3330043AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL M LAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8 MIAMI FL 33122 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3650036AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL M LAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8 MIAMI FL 33122 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less