This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/15/2021 at 01:21:07 (UTC).

PROMED IMAGING, LLC ET AL VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 PROMED IMAGING, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PROMED IMAGING, LLC

DE LA ROSA, JOSE

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tenenbaum, Jason, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Griggs, Marcus B.

 

Court Documents

Request for Admissions

09/14/2021 - Request for Admissions

Supplemental Request to Produce

09/14/2021 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Notice of Interrogatory

09/14/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/10/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

09/08/2021 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Motion for Extension of Time

08/23/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

08/23/2021 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/28/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/25/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Statement of Claim

06/22/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/22/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2650239AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:TENENBAUM, JASON, ESQ TENENBAUM LAW GROUP, PLLC 1600 PONCE DE LEON BLVD, CORAL GABLES FL 33134 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/26/2021 REGISTER#:265CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580340AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:TENENBAUM, JASON, ESQ TENENBAUM LAW GROUP, PLLC 1600 PONCE DE LEON BLVD, CORAL GABLES FL 33134 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/23/2021 REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Griggs, Marcus B.