This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/19/2023 at 17:36:59 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO VS C R S T SPECIALIZED TRANSPORTATION INC

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against C R S T SPECIALIZED TRANSPORTATION INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Progressive Select Ins Co

Defendant

C R S T Specialized Transportation Inc

Not Classified By Court

Sayegh, Nelson E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bowden, Jessie Elizabeth

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/08/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/08/2022 - Complaint

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

11/14/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2150003AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/08/2023REGISTER#:215CASHIER:ASHDC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: C R S T Specialized Transportation Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130178AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:BOWDEN, JESSIE ELIZABETH3845 5TH AVE NSAINT PETERSBURG FL 33713-7548COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:11/09/2022REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $8486.91

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less