This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/11/2020 at 10:07:38 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/01/2019 PROGRESSIVE HEALTH SERVICES, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Progressive Health Services, Inc.

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stuart L Koenigsberg Esq

Defendant Attorney

Brooks, Jonathan S

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Production

04/08/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/08/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Cancellation Notice

04/03/2019 - Cancellation Notice

Notice of Filing:

03/29/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

03/29/2019 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Order Granting Telephonic Hearing

03/15/2019 - Order Granting Telephonic Hearing

Demand for Jury Trial

01/31/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Pre Trial Summons

01/08/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

01/01/2019 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

04/01/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Production

03/29/2019 - Request for Production

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/28/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Filing:

03/18/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Hearing-

03/14/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Filing:

02/21/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Motion to Dismiss

02/05/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Email Notice:

01/31/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Filing:

01/28/2019 - Notice of Filing:

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31580:2192; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCancellation Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2310039AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3300047AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:STUART L KOENIGSBERG ESQ 8877 SW 131ST ST MIAMI FL 33176-5909 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less