This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/16/2021 at 08:21:26 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO VS WILMER JOHNNY PAREDES

Case Summary

On 09/19/2021 PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILMER JOHNNY PAREDES. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Progressive Express Ins Co

Defendant

Paredes, Wilmer Johnny

Not Classified By Court

Rasier (LLC) Period 2 & 3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Markcity, Michael R

 

Court Documents

Pre Trial Summons

09/27/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Email Notice:

09/19/2021 - Email Notice:

Statement of Claim

09/19/2021 - Statement of Claim

Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

09/19/2021 - Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/19/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Paredes Wilmer Johnny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2050006AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/27/2021 REGISTER#:205CASHIER:GVIVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2980124AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:MARKCITY, MICHAEL R MARKCITY, ROTHMAN, CANTWELL & BREITNER, P.A. SABAD PLANTATION FL 33324 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/21/2021 REGISTER#:298CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ESERVICE@MRCLAWYER.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $2325.54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Express Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Markcity, Michael Raymond