This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/25/2022 at 22:54:19 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO VS ROGER BRAYAN AGUILERA CHACON

Case Summary

On 06/11/2022 PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROGER BRAYAN AGUILERA CHACON. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Progressive Express Ins Co

Defendant

Aguilera Chacon, Roger Brayan

Not Classified By Court

Infinity Forklift

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Markcity, Michael R

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/11/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

06/11/2022 - Statement of Claim

Email Notice:

06/11/2022 - Email Notice:

Pre Trial Summons

06/29/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: North Dade Justice Center Courtroom 2-7 15555 Biscayne Blvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2060082AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:07/08/2022REGISTER#:206CASHIER:GVIVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Aguilera Chacon Roger Brayan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060336AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:MARKCITY, MICHAEL RMARKCITY, ROTHMAN, CANTWELL & BREITNER, P.A. SABADPLANTATION FL 33324COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:06/14/2022REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ESERVICE@MRCLAWYER.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $3446.61

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive Express Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Markcity, Michael Raymond