This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/12/2021 at 07:46:04 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO VS LUIS EDUARDO MATTIOLO MARRERO

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LUIS EDUARDO MATTIOLO MARRERO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Progressive Express Ins Co

Defendant

Mattiolo Marrero, Luis Eduardo

Not Classified By Court

Rasier (LLC) Period 2 & 3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Markcity, Michael R

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

10/08/2021 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

09/22/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Email Notice:

09/15/2021 - Email Notice:

Statement of Claim

09/15/2021 - Statement of Claim

Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

09/15/2021 - Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/15/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: North Dade Justice Center Courtroom 2-7 15555 Biscayne Blvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Mattiolo Marrero Luis Eduardo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2060005AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/29/2021 REGISTER#:206CASHIER:GVIVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Mattiolo Marrero Luis Eduardo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990250AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:MARKCITY, MICHAEL R MARKCITY, ROTHMAN, CANTWELL & BREITNER, P.A. SABAD PLANTATION FL 33324 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/16/2021 REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ESERVICE@MRCLAWYER.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $6358.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Express Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Markcity, Michael Raymond