This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/05/2020 at 07:51:42 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC. VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

VINCENCH ALEMAN, FERNAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee and Plaintiff Attorney

Armando A Brana

Defendant Attorney

Michael P Eglinton

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition

07/02/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Objection:

05/15/2019 - Objection:

Objection:

05/15/2019 - Objection:

Motion for Extension of Time

05/15/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Pretrial Catalog

03/22/2019 - Pretrial Catalog

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

03/12/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Email Notice:

03/12/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

01/24/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

01/24/2019 - Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

Voluntary Dismissal

11/18/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

11/18/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Memorandum of Disposition

10/08/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

10/04/2019 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Motion to Dismiss

10/03/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

09/13/2019 - Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Motion to Compel

09/13/2019 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Hearing-

08/14/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Compel

08/12/2019 - Motion to Compel

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31731:4652; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-7 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: CAROL/LINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Cancellation Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: 10/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3330050AMT PAID:($10.00) COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1 ($10.00) ($10.00) TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:($60.00) RECEIPT DATE:02/06/2019 REGISTER#:333CASHIER:DANTHOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3330044AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$60.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/06/2019 REGISTER#:333CASHIER:DANTHOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560056AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:ARMANDO A BRANA 7315 SW 87TH AVE STE. # 300 MIAMI FL 33173-5473 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less