Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/21/2021 at 20:22:33 (UTC).

PRO MEDICAL INSTITUTE, INC., VS ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC.,

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 PRO MEDICAL INSTITUTE, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC . This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PRO MEDICAL INSTITUTE, INC.,

Peralta, Eridania M.

Defendant

ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Iglesia, Jose R

 

Court Documents

Motion for Summary Judgment

04/13/2021 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Interrogatory

04/07/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

04/07/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

04/07/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

04/07/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

04/07/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

04/07/2021 - Request for Production

Statement of Claim

04/07/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/07/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-5 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2230099AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/13/2021 REGISTER#:223CASHIER:MARTHAV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2650071AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:IGLESIA, JOSE R LAW OFFICE OF JOSE R. IGLESIA LLC 7154 SW 47TH STR MIAMI FL 33155-4664 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/09/2021 REGISTER#:265CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. is a litigant