This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/04/2023 at 03:29:04 (UTC).

PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Assignee

Figueroa-Hernandez, Olman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emilio R Stillo

Defendant Attorneys

Atala, Anthony G, ESQ

Lovelady, Hillary

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/25/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/25/2023 - Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

01/25/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

01/25/2023 - Request for Production

Memorandum of Disposition

03/07/2023 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Service of Process

03/27/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Interrogatory

04/07/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

04/07/2023 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Notice:

04/07/2023 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

04/25/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

05/10/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

05/23/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

08/03/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

08/17/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580004AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$500.00RECEIPT DATE:03/15/2023REGISTER#:258CASHIER:E400452

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-1 3100 Ponce de Leon

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160531AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:EMILIO R STILLO7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203DAVIE FL 33314-4105COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:01/28/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less