This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/02/2022 at 08:12:05 (UTC).

PRINCIPLE CARE CENTER, INC. VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 PRINCIPLE CARE CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Principle Care Center, Inc.

Defendant

United Automobile Insurance Company

Assignee

Alberteris, Alexis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arias, Kelly M

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/30/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

09/30/2022 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

10/03/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/20/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/27/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: United Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130025AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ARIAS, KELLY MTHE EVOLUTION LAW GROUP PA 2700 GLADES CIRCLE SUITWESTON FL 33327COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/25/2022REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150073AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:ARIAS, KELLY MTHE EVOLUTION LAW GROUP PA 2700 GLADES CIRCLE SUITWESTON FL 33327COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:10/01/2022REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRINCIPLE CARE CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where United Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arias, Kelly M