This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/10/2020 at 09:22:46 (UTC).

PRINCETON GROVES VILLAGE LLC VS ORLANDO ENRIQUE CASTILLO ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 PRINCETON GROVES VILLAGE LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ORLANDO ENRIQUE CASTILLO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

Princeton Groves Village LLC

Defendants

Torres, Genesis

Castillo, Orlando Enrique

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan R Mccain

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

02/27/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Service Returned

02/20/2020 - Service Returned

Service Returned

02/20/2020 - Service Returned

Complaint

02/13/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31839:2347; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2250072AMT PAID:$20.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/18/2020 REGISTER#:225CASHIER:FERGUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Castillo Orlando Enrique; Torres Genesis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580261AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:RYAN R MCCAIN BARFIELD. MCCAIN , P.A. 4241 NORTHLAKE BLVD, STE B PALM BEACH GARDENS FL 33410 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.