Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/29/2020 at 03:00:06 (UTC).

PRIME MEDICAL & REHAB SERVICES OF NMB, INC. VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 PRIME MEDICAL REHAB SERVICES OF NMB, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRIME MEDICAL & REHAB SERVICES OF NMB, INC.

Assignor

PEREZ, MARLON

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michelle P. Babinksy, Esq

Defendant Attorney

Barrangan, Arlene

 

Court Documents

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

12/17/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

12/17/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

12/17/2020 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

11/24/2020 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

11/23/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

11/03/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Pre Trial Summons

10/26/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Production

10/09/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

10/09/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

10/09/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Appearance

10/09/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Statement of Claim

10/09/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/09/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-7 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2210112AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$100.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/26/2020 REGISTER#:221CASHIER:MARTHAV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2690043AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:MICHELLE P.BABINKSY, ESQ THE PAREDES BABINSKY LAW FIRM 9737 NW 41ST STREETDORAL FL 33178 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIME MEDICAL & REHAB SERVICES OF N.M.B., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barrangan, Arlene