This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/20/2022 at 20:44:23 (UTC).

PRIME MEDICAL & REHAB SERVICES OF N.M.B., INC. VS ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/30/2021 PRIME MEDICAL REHAB SERVICES OF N M B , INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRIME MEDICAL & REHAB SERVICES OF N.M.B., INC.

Assignor

CRUZ, ALEJANDRO

Defendant

ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michelle P. Babinksy, Esq

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/30/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

10/30/2021 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/02/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

11/02/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

11/02/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

11/02/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

11/02/2021 - Request for Admissions

Letter of Correspondence

11/02/2021 - Letter of Correspondence

Notice of Service of Process

11/16/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

11/23/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

11/29/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Dismiss

11/29/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Order Setting CM Deadline

12/02/2021 - Order Setting CM Deadline

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010109AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHELLE P.BABINKSY, ESQTHE PAREDES BABINSKY LAW FIRM 10 CANAL STREET STEMIAMI SPRINGS FL 33166COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:11/03/2021REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030258AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:MICHELLE P.BABINKSY, ESQTHE PAREDES BABINSKY LAW FIRM 10 CANAL STREET STEMIAMI SPRINGS FL 33166COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:11/02/2021REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIME MEDICAL & REHAB SERVICES OF N.M.B., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle P. Babinksy, Esq