This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/19/2023 at 15:07:34 (UTC).

PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH LC VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH LC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH LC

Assignor

GARCIA, LUIS

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignor Attorney

Philip Friedman

Defendant Attorney

Moses, Marsha Maria

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/25/2023 - Complaint

Order:

01/25/2023 - Order:

Receipt:

01/25/2023 - Receipt:

Text

01/25/2023 - Text

Letter of Correspondence

01/25/2023 - Letter of Correspondence

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/30/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

02/16/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Email Notice:

03/23/2023 - Email Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MDBRUMLEY@FLLEGALGROUP.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2950039AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:TRANSFERCOMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:01/25/2023REGISTER#:295CASHIER:BEPEREZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: PHILIP FRIEDMAN ESQ - MARSHA MOSES ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: CASE SUMMARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less