This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/25/2021 at 17:14:29 (UTC).

PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH, L.C. VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH, L C filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH, L.C.

Assignor

Marini, Juniper

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

Defendant Attorney

Nanes, Tamara, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

06/04/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion in Limine

05/08/2020 - Motion in Limine

Notice of Interrogatory

05/08/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

05/08/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

05/08/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

05/08/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

05/08/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

05/08/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

05/08/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Production

05/08/2020 - Request for Production

Motion for Extension of Time

05/07/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Email Notice:

04/27/2020 - Email Notice:

Request for Admissions

04/27/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

04/27/2020 - Request for Production

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/16/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

04/08/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Statement of Claim

02/26/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/26/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31959:2082; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion in Limine; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event; Comments: REGARDING WORKER'S COMPENSATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event; Comments: REGARDING SPORTS RELATED INJURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490002AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/05/2020 REGISTER#:349CASHIER:JONESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3620054AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.0

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Presgar Imaging of CMI South, LC is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.