This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/27/2020 at 17:30:26 (UTC).

PRECISION DIAGNOSTIC OF LAKE WORTH, LLC VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 PRECISION DIAGNOSTIC OF LAKE WORTH, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Precision Diagnostic of Lake Worth, LLC

Assignor

Bonilla, Connie

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Patino Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

Johnson, Jalesa

 

Court Documents

Answer and Affirmative Defense

01/29/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion to Compel

04/07/2020 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Strike

02/05/2020 - Motion to Strike

Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

01/29/2020 - Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

Request for Production

01/29/2020 - Request for Production

Response to Request for Production

08/03/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Motion for Extension of Time

08/19/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Response to Request for Admissions

02/12/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

08/03/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event; Comments: REGARDING FEE SCHEDULE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2320058AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/30/2019 REGISTER#:232CASHIER:IRIARTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3680004AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM 5005 LEJEUNE ROAD HIALEAH FL 33013 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Precision Diagnostic of Lake Worth LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant