This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/31/2022 at 09:04:39 (UTC).

PONCE, OMAR E VS MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 PONCE, OMAR E filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ponce, Omar E

Ponce, Olga M

Defendants

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jimenez, Julisse

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/01/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

04/01/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/12/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100046AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ROMY B JURADO10800 BISCAYNE BOULEVARD 850MIAMI FL 33161COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/13/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090215AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JIMENEZ, JULISSEJURADO & FARSHCHIAN, P.L. 12955 BISCAYNE BOULEVARDNORTH MIAMI FL 33181COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:04/05/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimenez, Julisse