This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/01/2019 at 16:37:38 (UTC).

POLAT, ERDEM VS POLAT, GISELLE

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 POLAT, ERDEM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against POLAT, GISELLE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Polat, Erdem

Respondent

Polat, Giselle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Polat Giselle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Polat Giselle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3400008AMT PAID:$50.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3340-SHERIFF - DADE1$40.00$40.00 TENDER TYPE:MASTER CARDTENDER AMT:$50.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/15/2019 REG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Summons Issued for Sheriff Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: ALIAS Parties: Polat Giselle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Acknowledgement of Receipt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Application for Determination of Indigent Status Approved; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2470028AMT PAID:$40.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3340-SHERIFF - DADE1$40.00$40.00 TENDER TYPE:MASTER CARDTENDER AMT:$40.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/11/2019 REGISTER#:247CASHIER:E323093

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2470027AMT PAID:$419.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$419.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/11/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Filed at Courthouse Center; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Summons Issued for Sheriff Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.