Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/06/2020 at 08:07:35 (UTC).

POINT LAKE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION THREE INC VS ROIMEL COLUMBIE

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 POINT LAKE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION THREE INC filed an Other lawsuit against ROIMEL COLUMBIE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POINT LAKE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION THREE INC

Defendant

Columbie, Roimel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Muriel, Melisa

BAIR, JACOB

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

09/11/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Memorandum of Disposition

09/10/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Hearing-

08/14/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Default

08/09/2019 - Motion for Default

Motion for Default

08/09/2019 - Motion for Default

Service Return for Unknown Party

08/09/2019 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Motion for Default

08/07/2019 - Motion for Default

Notice:

07/12/2019 - Notice:

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/26/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Voluntary Dismissal

10/25/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Non-Military Affidavit

08/12/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Service Returned

08/07/2019 - Service Returned

Notice:

07/12/2019 - Notice:

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/26/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/26/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/26/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

06/26/2019 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Complaint

06/17/2019 - Complaint

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3550001AMT PAID:$5.00 NAME:BAIR, JACOB 301 W PLATT ST #375 TAMPA FL 33606 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$5.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDischarge/release of Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 31673:2484; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31673:2483; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Columbie Roimel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketMotion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Columbie Roimel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event; Comments: JBAIR@BLAWGROUP.COM Parties: BAIR JACOB; POINT LAKE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION THREE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3540215AMT PAID:$305.00 NAME:MURIEL, MELISA 301 W. PLATT ST. #375 TAMPA FL 33606 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 2142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens; Book/Page: 31490:2825; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURIEL , MELISA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOB BAIR