This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/10/2022 at 03:46:07 (UTC).

PMG-S2 SUNNY ISLES, LLC VS FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 PMG-S2 SUNNY ISLES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PMG-S2 SUNNY ISLES, LLC

Defendants

GOMEZ, ELBA CHARA

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rodriguez, Javier J.

Defendant Attorneys

Conte, Jessica Erin

Dunn, Lindsay Rae

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

04/28/2020 - Service Returned

Motion:

05/07/2020 - Motion:

Motion for Default

09/21/2020 - Motion for Default

Notice of Appearance

10/09/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Final Judgment

10/14/2020 - Motion for Final Judgment

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/16/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

03/11/2020 - Complaint

Publication Rejection Letter

07/07/2020 - Publication Rejection Letter

Order:

05/12/2020 - Order:

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11/05/20 AT 09:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 32191:3480; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Indebtedness; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: HEARING SET FOR 11/5/20 AT 9:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: 10/14/20 AT 09:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Final Judgment; Event Type: Event; Comments: PL.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON PLTF.MOTION TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION/GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EFFECTUATESERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2790336AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:RODRIGUEZ, JAVIER J.78 SW 7TH STREETMIAMI FL 33131COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/18/2020REGISTER#:279CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580126AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:RODRIGUEZ, JAVIER J.78 SW 7TH STREETMIAMI FL 33131COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:03/13/2020REGISTER#:358CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PMG-S2 SUNNY ISLES, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodriguez, Javier J.