This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/28/2021 at 09:38:26 (UTC).

PMG-S2 SUNNY ISLES, LLC ET AL VS FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 PMG-S2 SUNNY ISLES, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FLORIDA POWER LIGHT. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PMG-S2 Sunny Isles, LLC

ACE American Insurance Company

PMG - S2 Sunny Isles, LLC

Defendant

Florida Power & Light

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig M. Greene, Esq.

Defendant Attorney

Torrents Roque, Angelica, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unavailability/absence

10/14/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Request for Production

10/13/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

10/13/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Answer and Affirmative Defense

10/13/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Service Returned

09/29/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/21/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/20/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

09/15/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/15/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event; Comments: COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Torrents Roque Angelica ESQ; Florida Power & Light

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Florida Power & Light

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000102AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:CRAIG M. GREENE, ESQ. 4000 HOLLYWOOD BLVD STE 485 S HOLLYWOOD FL 33021-6751 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/22/2021 REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Florida Power & Light

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020030AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:CRAIG M. GREENE, ESQ. 4000 HOLLYWOOD BLVD STE 485 S HOLLYWOOD FL 33021-6751 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/17/2021 REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PMG-S2 SUNNY ISLES, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Power & Light Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ACE American Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation, and ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co., a Pennsylvania corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Torrents Roque, Angelica, ESQ