This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/10/2023 at 20:17:19 (UTC).

PLANTATION OPEN MRI, LLC. VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 PLANTATION OPEN MRI, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLANTATION OPEN MRI, LLC.

Assignor

ETZLER, AMANDA

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Weinstein, Justin, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/06/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

12/06/2022 - Statement of Claim

Notice:

12/06/2022 - Notice:

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

12/12/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Interrogatory

01/09/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/09/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

01/09/2023 - Request for Admissions

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/12/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/20/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

02/23/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Motion:

02/26/2023 - Motion:

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/06/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Response to Request for Admissions

03/06/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160415AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:WEINSTEIN, JUSTIN, ESQ514 NE 13 STREETFT LAUDERDALE FL 33304COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/19/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100587AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:WEINSTEIN, JUSTIN, ESQ514 NE 13 STREETFT LAUDERDALE FL 33304COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:12/08/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 99.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less