This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/12/2023 at 00:29:44 (UTC).

PLANTATION OPEN MRI, LLC. VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/16/2023 PLANTATION OPEN MRI, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLANTATION OPEN MRI, LLC.

Assignor

RODRIGUEZ, JOSE

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Weinstein, Justin, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/16/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/16/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice:

01/16/2023 - Notice:

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/23/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Interrogatory

02/17/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

02/17/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

02/17/2023 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/20/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/01/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190163AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:WEINSTEIN, JUSTIN, ESQ514 NE 13 STREETFT LAUDERDALE FL 33304COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/01/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160869AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:WEINSTEIN, JUSTIN, ESQ514 NE 13 STREETFT LAUDERDALE FL 33304COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:01/19/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less