This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/19/2019 at 02:57:33 (UTC).

PIERRE, MERALT M. VS CLEBERT, MARIE M.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 PIERRE, MERALT M filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against CLEBERT, MARIE M. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pierre, Meralt M.

Respondent

Clebert, Marie M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Cruz-Townsend, Peggy

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

05/13/2019 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31446:2573; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Order of Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Uncontest/diss; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PEGGY CRUZ-TOWNSEND, ESQ., 954-524-5297

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON MOTION TO PERMIT TESTIMONY BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Motion for Default and Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Motion for Telephonic Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 5-13-19 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Notice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: MAY 6, 2019 @ 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Notice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530064AMT PAID:$301.00 NAME:CRUZ-TOWNSEND, PEGGY 110 SE 6TH ST STE 1700 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301-5047 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$301.00$301.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Affidavit of Petitioner - Child Custody Jurisdiction; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Hearing Info: Uncontest/diss; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less