Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/22/2021 at 18:40:11 (UTC).

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY VS HANNA ZAKI & COMPANY, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HANNA ZAKI COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

HANNA ZAKI & COMPANY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel E. Levin

 

Court Documents

Notice:

04/21/2021 - Notice:

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/13/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Request for Production

04/12/2021 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/12/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

04/09/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/09/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RETURN OF SERVICE WITHOT SUMMONS - HANNA ZAKI & COMPANY SERVED 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600058AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:DANIEL E. LEVIN 222 LAKEVIEW AVE STE 120 WEST PALM BEACH FL 33401-6146 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/14/2021 REGISTER#:260CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: HANNA ZAKI & COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2610161AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:DANIEL E. LEVIN 222 LAKEVIEW AVE STE 120 WEST PALM BEACH FL 33401-6146 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/10/2021 REGISTER#:261CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVIN, DANIEL ERIC