This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/31/2022 at 22:16:47 (UTC).

PHEONIX HOLDING LLC VS LAZARA SIMPSON

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 PHEONIX HOLDING LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LAZARA SIMPSON. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-20

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHEONIX HOLDING LLC

Defendant

SIMPSON, LAZARA

Not Classified By Court

EVICTION PROPERTY ADDRESS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/02/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/02/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Service Returned

12/05/2022 - Service Returned

Answer

12/12/2022 - Answer

Order:

12/13/2022 - Order:

Motion to Strike

12/16/2022 - Motion to Strike

Affidavit as to Costs

12/16/2022 - Affidavit as to Costs

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event; Comments: NON-PAYMENT OF RENT & NON MILITARY AFF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SIMPSON LAZARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: COURT REGISTRY DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SIMPSON LAZARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SIMPSON LAZARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SIMPSON LAZARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SIMPSON LAZARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVICTION PROPERTY ADDRESS is a litigant

Latest cases where Pheonix Holding Llc is a litigant