This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/15/2020 at 02:33:42 (UTC).

PEREZ BELLO, LOURDES VS HERNANDEZ, DANIEL RUBEN

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 PEREZ BELLO, LOURDES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, DANIEL RUBEN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Perez Bello, Lourdes

Respondents

Hernandez, Daniel R

Hernandez, Daniel Ruben

Minors

Hernandez, Daniel Jacob

Hernandez, Daniel J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jaime, Vivian A.

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

11/06/2019 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment; Book/Page: 31680:3566; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketUncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: EVIDENCE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING COURSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11-6-19 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketParenting Plan; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketMarital Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510019AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:JAIME, VIVIAN A. 2915 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 300 MIAMI FL 33137-4197 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$409.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketRequired Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Petitioner - Child Custody Jurisdiction; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketChild Support Worksheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAnswer and Waiver; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketPetition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.