This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/01/2022 at 14:59:34 (UTC).

PEDRO J. GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER OF MIAMI VS SE MIDTOWN 5 LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/28/2022 PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER OF MIAMI filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against SE MIDTOWN 5 LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEDRO J. GARCIA, as Property Appraiser of Miami

Defendants

SE MIDTOWN 5 LLC

JIM ZINGALE, as Executive Director of the State of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonzon-Keenan, Geraldine Teresa

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/28/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/28/2022 - Complaint

Lis Pendens

07/29/2022 - Lis Pendens

Notice:

08/25/2022 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

08/29/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/29/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENDANT, JIM ZINGALE, STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, ON THIS 15TH DAY OF AUGUST 2022. UNDER FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.070(I)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000124AMT PAID:$410.00NAME:BONZON-KEENAN, GERALDINE TERESA111 NW 1ST ST STE 2800MIAMI FL 33128-1930COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$410.00RECEIPT DATE:07/30/2022REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33314:1115; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less