*************A-01
07/28/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Other - Writ Of Mandamus
Miami-Dade, Florida
PEDRO J. GARCIA, as Property Appraiser of Miami
KAY BOTET
BELKOV, SONIA
ZAIAS, NARDO
GARDEN STATE SWEETWATERS LLC
SWEET REEF LLC
EMPIRE STATE SWEETWATER LLC
STILLWATER DRIVE INVESTMENT HOLDINGS LLC
JIM ZINGALE, as Executive Director of the State of
Bonzon-Keenan, Geraldine Teresa
12/21/2022 - Service Returned
12/12/2022 - Service Returned
12/02/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense
11/28/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline
11/22/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time
11/22/2022 - Order Extending Time for
10/12/2022 - Answer
10/06/2022 - Service Returned
10/06/2022 - Service Returned
07/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory
07/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory
07/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory
07/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory
07/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory
07/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory
07/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory
07/28/2022 - Complaint
07/28/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event
[-] Read Less