This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/25/2022 at 09:59:37 (UTC).

PEDRO J. GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER OF MIAMI VS KAY BOTET ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/28/2022 PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER OF MIAMI filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against KAY BOTET. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEDRO J. GARCIA, as Property Appraiser of Miami

Defendants

KAY BOTET

BELKOV, SONIA

ZAIAS, NARDO

GARDEN STATE SWEETWATERS LLC

SWEET REEF LLC

EMPIRE STATE SWEETWATER LLC

STILLWATER DRIVE INVESTMENT HOLDINGS LLC

JIM ZINGALE, as Executive Director of the State of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonzon-Keenan, Geraldine Teresa

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

12/21/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/12/2022 - Service Returned

Answer and Affirmative Defense

12/02/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Order Setting CM Deadline

11/28/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Motion for Extension of Time

11/22/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Extending Time for

11/22/2022 - Order Extending Time for

Answer

10/12/2022 - Answer

Service Returned

10/06/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

10/06/2022 - Service Returned

Notice of Interrogatory

07/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

07/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

07/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

07/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

07/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

07/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

07/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

07/28/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/28/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less