This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/15/2023 at 05:54:40 (UTC).

PEDRO J. GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER OF MIAMI VS DEZER BLUE GRASS, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER OF MIAMI filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against DEZER BLUE GRASS, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEDRO J. GARCIA, as Property Appraiser of Miami

Defendants

DEZER BLUE GRASS, LLC

M & R, LLC

DEZER, MICHAEL

DEZERTOV, NEOMI

JIM ZINGALE, as Executive Director of the State of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonzon-Keenan, Geraldine Teresa

 

Court Documents

Lis Pendens

08/02/2022 - Lis Pendens

Request for Production

07/29/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

07/29/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

07/29/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

07/29/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

07/29/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

07/29/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

07/29/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

07/29/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Final Judgment by Judge

01/13/2023 - Final Judgment by Judge

Order of Dismissal

12/15/2022 - Order of Dismissal

Order Setting CM Deadline

12/01/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Settlement Agreement

10/05/2022 - Settlement Agreement

Notice:

09/20/2022 - Notice:

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 33547:2207; Event Type: Event; Comments: STIPULATED, RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS, AND ORDER TO CLOSE CASE Parties: DEZER BLUE GRASS LLC; M & R LLC; DEZER MICHAEL; DEZERTOV NEOMI; JIM ZINGALE as Executive Director of the State of

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: BASED ON SETTLEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33506:2964; Event Type: Event; Comments: BASED ON SETTLEMENT Parties: DEZER BLUE GRASS LLC; M & R LLC; DEZER MICHAEL; DEZERTOV NEOMI; JIM ZINGALE as Executive Director of the State of

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2022

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 20. Parties: M & R LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2022

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 17. Parties: DEZER BLUE GRASS LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less